This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:55:05 (UTC).

PATEL VS BOWEN

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 PATEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BOWEN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brehmer, Charles R. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0457

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brehmer, Charles R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATEL, JINAL K.

Defendant

BOWEN, CHRISTOPHER B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEHLAWAT, NEIL K

Defendant Attorney

O'ROURKE, SEAN THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

**MO - Public cmc: Judicial Officer: Brehmer, Charles R.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: O'ROURKE, SEAN THOMAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Entire action is dismissed with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - **MO - Public cmc: Judicial Officer: Brehmer, Charles R.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: O'ROURKE, SEAN THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • Jury Non-refundable fee pursuant to CCP 631 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Jury Non-refundable fee pursuant to CCP 631 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to defendant Christopher B Bowen; substituted service on 8-1-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRCC3.110 Hearing Date: 10/29/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less