This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 08:04:06 (UTC).

PARS 15, LLC VS NUNEZ

Case Summary

On 02/09/2017 PARS 15, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NUNEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0093

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARS 15, LLC

Defendant

NUNEZ, VALERIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG, RACHEL YUN MEE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of service for Daniel Blodgett

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DANIEL BLODGETT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DANIEL BLODGETT

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PARS 15, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1950 CENTER STREET #13 ROSAMOND CA 93560; Awarded Against: NUNEZ, VALERIA; Party: Names: NUNEZ, VALERIA; PARS 15, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DANIEL BLODGETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DANIEL BLODGETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of service for Daniel Blodgett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA MAIL MICHELSON ATTORNEY SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: FOR VALERIA NUNEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: FOR ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION IN CARE OF NAMED TENANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: POS & ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PARS 15, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.