This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 05:53:21 (UTC).

PARS 15, LLC VS GLOVER SCHROEDER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 PARS 15, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GLOVER SCHROEDER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0052

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARS 15, LLC

Defendants

GLOVER-SCHROEDER, MARY F.

LEYVA, MIGUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, CHRIS J

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 03/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PARS 15, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 2631 Desert Street, #38 Rosamond, Ca 93560 County of KERN; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: GLOVER-SCHROEDER, MARY F.; LEYVA, MIGUEL; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $810.00; Holdover Damages: $2,200.06; Attorney Fees: $350.00; Costs: $330.00; Total: $3,690.06; Party: Names: PARS 15, LLC; GLOVER-SCHROEDER, MARY F.; LEYVA, MIGUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Writ of Possession Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA MAIL TO MICHELSON ATTORNEY SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Judgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 03/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD) - Comment: Request for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Comment: REQUEST TO SET TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS-NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR MARY F. GLOVER SCHROEDER-NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PARS 15, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PARS 15, LLC, GLOVER-SCHROEDER, MARY F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.