This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 05:07:50 (UTC).

PARS 15, LLC VS DESAUTELS

Case Summary

On 01/13/2017 PARS 15, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DESAUTELS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0036

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARS 15, LLC

Defendant

DESAUTELS, KANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, CHRIS J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PARS 15, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 3400 15th Street West #103 Rosamond, CA 93560; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: DESAUTELS, KANDY; Party: Names: DESAUTELS, KANDY; PARS 15, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Kern County. Mail to Michelson Attorney Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: 4 26.66 of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Kandy Desautels and All Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to All Unnamed Occupants in possession in care of Named tenants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: as to Kandy Desautels

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR KANDY DESAUTELS-NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PARS 15, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.