This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 04:16:15 (UTC).

PARS 15, LLC VS CROWE

Case Summary

On 01/04/2017 PARS 15, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CROWE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0005

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARS 15, LLC

Defendant

CROWE, ELYMIA S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, CHRIS J

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 03/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Defendant: CROWE, ELYMIA S.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PARS 15, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 3400 15th Street West, #41 Rosamond, CA 93560; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Other: No lockout prior to 04/03/17 at 6:00 am.; Awarded Against: CROWE, ELYMIA S.; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $3,600.00; Attorney Fees: $500.00; Costs: $300.00; Total: $4,400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA MAIL TO MICHELSON ATTORNEY SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Stipulated Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 03/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Defendant: CROWE, ELYMIA S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Notice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Request for trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Does 1 through 10

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2017
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Comment: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Electronic Rejection Notice - Comment: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PARS 15, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.