This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 04:16:34 (UTC).

PARS 15, LLC VS COLLEN FETTERS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/04/2017 PARS 15, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COLLEN FETTERS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARS 15, LLC

Defendants

COLLEN FETTERS, TINA

TINA COLLEN FETTERS AKA TINA COLLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, CHRIS J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PARS 15, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1950 CENTER STREET #14 ROSAMOND CA 93560; Awarded Against: TINA COLLEN FETTERS AKA TINA COLLEN; Party: Names: COLLEN FETTERS, TINA; PARS 15, LLC; TINA COLLEN FETTERS AKA TINA COLLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA MAIL TO MICHELSON ATTORNEY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AGAINST TINA COLLEN FETTERS AKA TINA COLLEN & ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AGAINST DOES 1 THROUGH 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: FOR TINA COLLEN FETTERS AKA TINA COLLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION IN CARE OF NAMED TENANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Declaration and Order to Post Filed - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS-NOTICE OF UNALWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR TINA COLLEN FETTERS AKA TINA COLLEN-NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PARS 15, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.