This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:46:11 (UTC).

PARS 15, LLC VS BARTLETT, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 PARS 15, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BARTLETT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0205

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARS 15, LLC

Defendants

BARTLETT, JAMILA

BARTLETT, MICHAEL AARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, CHRIS J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PARS 15, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 3400 15TH STREET WEST #66 ROSAMOND CA 93560; Awarded Against: BARTLETT, MICHAEL AARON; BARTLETT, JAMILA; Party: Names: BARTLETT, MICHAEL AARON; PARS 15, LLC; BARTLETT, JAMILA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA MAIL TO MICHELSON ATTORNEY SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AGAINST MICHAEL AARON BARTLETT, JAMILA BARTLETT, & ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR JAMILA BARTLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR MICHAEL AARON BARTLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION IN CARE OF NAMED TENANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PARS 15, LLC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less