This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:35:35 (UTC).

PARKER VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 PARKER filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2372

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARKER, JERRY

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

BURNS, KRISTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OVIEDO, OVIDIO

Defendant Attorney

BRANNEN, JAMES L

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/14/2019: Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC/CT 3/18/19 T/E 2 Days

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 02/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/26/18 Plaintiff, JERRY PARKER Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative Summary Adjudication ResID: 33577; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OVIEDO, OVIDIO

Ruling

Ruling 12/11/2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 08/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont 06/20/18; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OVIEDO, OVIDIO; Defendant; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L; Defendant; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L

Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition) 06/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/16/18 Plaintiff, JERRY PARKER Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Verified Complaint for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, and Equitable Relief ResID: 30906; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L; Defendant; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT 05/24/18 to be heard with Motions at 8:30; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L; Defendant; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 05/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT 04/09/18

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OVIEDO, OVIDIO; Defendant; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L

Demurrer First Amended Complaint

Demurrer First Amended Complaint 02/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/25/18 Defendants, CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS REHABILITATION; KRISTY BURNS Demurrer to First Amended Complaint ResID: 28970; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L

Demurrer

Motion to Strike 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions Held; Comment: 12/8/17 Defendant, CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION Demurrer to Complaint ResID: 28560; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OVIEDO, OVIDIO; Defendant; Attorney: BRANNEN, JAMES L

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: /final Case Management T/E 2 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketOrder on Motion - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: ** DENIED ** Motion for Summary Judgment Having considered the record and briefs submitted by the parties and oral argument, the Court denies the Motion. IT IS SO ORDERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 02/14/2019: Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC/CT 3/18/19 T/E 2 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication - Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 02/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/26/18 Plaintiff, JERRY PARKER Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative Summary Adjudication ResID: 33577

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketReply - Comment: to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketNotice - Comment: [Amended] of Motion to Strike Hearing Date: 1/10/18 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketDemurrer - Comment: Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Date: 1/10/18 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: Motion to Strike Damages Alleged in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Hearing Date: 1/10/18 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/24/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/09/2017; Served: 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less