This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 07:13:55 (UTC).

VENEGAS VS BROTT

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 VENEGAS filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BROTT. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0367

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

PARADISE, JIM

VENEGAS, VANESSA ALENE

Respondents

PARADISE, TERI CAIRD

BROTT, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ANDERSON, LESLIE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 03/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: VENEGAS, VANESSA ALENE

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 03/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Department Transfer; Parties Present Petitioner: VENEGAS, VANESSA ALENE

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: VENEGAS, VANESSA ALENE; Respondent: BROTT, THOMAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Party: Names: VENEGAS, VANESSA ALENE; BROTT, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 03/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 03/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Department Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Comment: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New No Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less