This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:36:49 (UTC).

PAPAC VS PAPAC

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 PAPAC filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PAPAC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0095

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Papac, Terry

Respondent

Papac, Thomas

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less