This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:54:19 (UTC).

PANTOJA VS MUNOZ

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 PANTOJA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MUNOZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4641

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PANTOJA, PEDRO

Respondent

MUNOZ, STEPHANIE MARIE

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/04/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.OO; Parties Present Petitioner: PANTOJA, PEDRO

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2017
  • Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 4/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: Arrangement - TOTAL FEES DUE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; Hearing on Waiver of Fees 11/04/2016: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.OO; Parties Present Petitioner: PANTOJA, PEDRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: HRG 11/04/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: THIRD PARTY TYPING SERVICE: A SIMPLE DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less