This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 14:33:51 (UTC).

PAN AMERICAN BANK VS HECKATHORN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/22/2015 PAN AMERICAN BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HECKATHORN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G., Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0130

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAN AMERICAN BANK

Defendants

LINDSEY HECKATHORN

HECKATHORN, CLETE CHARLES

CLETE HECKATHORN

HECKATHORN, LINDSEY MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, STEVEN A

 

Court Documents

Claim of Exemption

**MO - Public: Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Ruling; Comment: TO DETERMINE THE CLAIM OF EXEMPTION OF THE JUDGMENT DEBTOR.; Parties Present Defendant: HECKATHORN, CLETE CHARLES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Exemption - **MO - Public: Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Ruling; Comment: TO DETERMINE THE CLAIM OF EXEMPTION OF THE JUDGMENT DEBTOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketNotice of Opposition/Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketConfidential Statement - Comment: Confidential Statement of Judgment Debtor's SSN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing of Claim of Exemption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Returned Original Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern/Original Returned Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest - Comment: Returned Endorsed Copy Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Re: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PAN AMERICAN BANK; Awarded Against: HECKATHORN, CLETE CHARLES; HECKATHORN, LINDSEY MARIE; Amount; Damages: $5,477.89; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 15.99 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,184.84; Attorney Fees: $3,281.09; Costs: $520.00; Total: $11463.82; Party: Names: PAN AMERICAN BANK; HECKATHORN, CLETE CHARLES; HECKATHORN, LINDSEY MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Pejudice As To Does 1 to 10 Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by personal service, Lindsey Marie Heckathorn aka Lindsey Heckathorn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: by personal service as to Clete Charles Heckathorn aka Clete Heckathorn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PAN AMERICAN BANK; Served: 01/07/20165:31 PM; Served: 01/07/20165:31 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: of Venue Pursuant to California Civil Code Sections 2984.4 and/or 1812.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less