This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 14:54:17 (UTC).

PAN AMERICAN BANK VS AMES

Case Summary

On 12/31/2015 PAN AMERICAN BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R., Phillips, Craig G., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0136

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Phillips, Craig G.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAN AMERICAN BANK

Defendants

AMES, FREDRICK

FREDRICK BRYAN AMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, STEVEN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re:Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PAN AMERICAN BANK; Awarded Against: AMES, FREDRICK; Amount; Damages: $8,971.13; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 17.99 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $926.31; Attorney Fees: $1,610.37; Costs: $300.00; Total: $11807.81; Party: Names: PAN AMERICAN BANK; AMES, FREDRICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Total: $11807.81 As To: Fredrick Ames aka Fredrick Bryan Ames

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Rafaela Lockridge Pursuant to CCP 585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Of Steven A. Silver Regarding Interest And Attorney Fees Calculating Pursuant To CCP 585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As To Fredrick Ames aka Fredrick Bryan Ames

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice As To Does 1 to 10 Only"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Re:Proof of Serivce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: As to Fredrick Ames aka Fredrick Bryan Ames

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PAN AMERICAN BANK; Served: 01/19/20161:06 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less