This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 20:10:47 (UTC).

PAN AMERICAN BANK, SUCCESOR-IN-INTEREST TO FINANCE AND THRIFT VS TABAREZ

Case Summary

On 03/21/2016 PAN AMERICAN BANK, SUCCESOR-IN-INTEREST TO FINANCE AND THRIFT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TABAREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Camacho, Marcos R. and Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0081

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Camacho, Marcos R.

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAN AMERICAN BANK, SUCCESOR-IN-INTEREST TO FINANCE AND THRIFT

Defendant

TABAREZ, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, STEVEN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PAN AMERICAN BANK, SUCCESOR-IN-INTEREST TO FINANCE AND THRIFT; Awarded Against: TABAREZ, ROBERT; Amount; Damages: $6,027.26; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 15.99 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $502.00; Attorney Fees: $1,235.87; Costs: $300.00; Total: $8065.13; Party: Names: PAN AMERICAN BANK, SUCCESOR-IN-INTEREST TO FINANCE AND THRIFT; TABAREZ, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Attorney Re: Interest and Attorney Fees Calculation Pursuant to CCP 585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Lockridge Pursuant to CCP 585 (d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Does 1 to 10 Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PAN AMERICAN BANK, SUCCESOR-IN-INTEREST TO FINANCE AND THRIFT; Served: 04/27/20165:19 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.