This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/18/2018 at 03:10:17 (UTC).

PAN AMERICA BANK VS VILLAGRANA

Case Summary

On 10/05/2015 PAN AMERICA BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VILLAGRANA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Domnitz, H. Ronald, Witt, Gary R. and Staley, H.A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0088

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Domnitz, H. Ronald

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAN AMERICA BANK

PAN AMERICA BANK, SUCCESSOR -IN- INTEREST TO FINANCE AND THRIFT

Defendant

VILLAGRANA, GERARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, STEVEN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PAN AMERICA BANK, SUCCESSOR -IN- INTEREST TO FINANCE AND THRIFT; Awarded Against: VILLAGRANA, GERARDO; Amount; Damages: $1,978.81; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 14.90 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $135.00; Attorney Fees: $395.78; Costs: $300.00; Total: $2809.59; Party: Names: PAN AMERICA BANK, SUCCESSOR -IN- INTEREST TO FINANCE AND THRIFT; VILLAGRANA, GERARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer(s): Staley, H.A. "Skip", Domnitz, H. Ronald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: RE:Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Total: 2809.59 As To Gerardo Villlagrana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Of Rafael Lockridge Pursuant To CCP 585 (d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Of Steven A. Silver Regarding Interest And Attorney Fees Calculation Pursuant To CCp 585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Gerardo Villagrana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Does 1 to 10 Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: RE:Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: by personal service as to Gerardo Villagrana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PAN AMERICA BANK, SUCCESSOR -IN- INTEREST TO FINANCE AND THRIFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less