This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:16:17 (UTC).

PALACPAC VS PALACPAC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 PALACPAC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PALACPAC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benavides, Jose R. and Katz, Steven M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0001

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benavides, Jose R.

Katz, Steven M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALACPAC, RONY P

Defendant

PALACPAC, JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 02/19/2020: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PALACPAC, RONY P; Judgment Amount: $670.00; Awarded Against: PALACPAC, JEFFREY; Amount; Damages: $600.00; Costs: $70.00; Total: $670.00; Party: Names: PALACPAC, RONY P; PALACPAC, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 02/19/2020: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PALACPAC, RONY P; Served: 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.