This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:49:34 (UTC).

PAL VS WILEY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 PAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WILEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1443

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAL, VIJAY

PAL, DHARAM

Defendant

WILEY, TANISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEAKE, ALAN J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PAL, DHARAM; PAL, VIJAY; Awarded Against: WILEY, TANISHA; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $2,025.00; Holdover Damages: $607.50; Costs: $455.00; Total: $3,087.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketFinal Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Cause_of_actionCause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 05/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: as to Tanisha Wiley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PAL, DHARAM; PAL, VIJAY; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 720 TERRACE WAY, #14 , BAKERSFIELD , CA 93304; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: WILEY, TANISHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: RETURN AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: TANISHA WILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: TANISHA WILEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PAL, DHARAM, PAL, VIJAY; Served: 03/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 720 TERRACE WAY, #14 BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.