This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:08:09 (UTC).

PAL VS GUERRERO

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 PAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUERRERO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5669

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAL, VIJAY

PAL, DHARAM

Defendant

GUERRERO, BETTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEAKE, ALAN J

Defendant Attorney

DALEY, CHRISTA

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 11/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 11/28/17; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PEAKE, ALAN J; Plaintiff; Attorney: PEAKE, ALAN J; Defendant; Attorney: DALEY, CHRISTA

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 11/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: ANSWER FILED BY BETTY GUERRERO . TIME ESTIMATE 1 HR; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PEAKE, ALAN J; Plaintiff; Attorney: PEAKE, ALAN J; Defendant; Attorney: DALEY, CHRISTA

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PAL, DHARAM; PAL, VIJAY; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 2033 1/2 McCray St Bakersfield CA 93308; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: GUERRERO, BETTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketStipulated Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 11/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 11/28/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 11/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: ANSWER FILED BY BETTY GUERRERO . TIME ESTIMATE 1 HR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: all unknown occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Betty Guerrero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: In Pro Per New Attorney: Christa Daley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PAL, DHARAM, PAL, VIJAY; Served: 11/08/20177:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 2033-1/2 MCCRAY STREET, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.