This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:49:38 (UTC).

PAL VS DONIS

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 PAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DONIS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1444

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAL, VIJAY

PAL, DHARAM

Defendant

DONIS, CYNTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEAKE, ALAN J

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 04/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON THE DEMURRER; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: PEAKE, ALAN J; Plaintiff; Attorney: PEAKE, ALAN J; Defendant: DONIS, CYNTHIA

Ruling

Ruling 04/13/2017: Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketAmended Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Stipulated Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: PAL, DHARAM; PAL, VIJAY; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 2029 McCray St # 2 Bakersfield CA 93308; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: DONIS, CYNTHIA; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $2,175.00; Holdover Damages: $1,570.00; Attorney Fees: $500.00; Costs: $285.00; Total: $4,530.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketStipulated Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 04/13/2017: Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) 05/22/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: ANSWER FILED BY CYNTHIA DONIS . TIME ESTIMATE 1 HR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketNotice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketOrder After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Returned via AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: by clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketDemurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: PAL, DHARAM, PAL, VIJAY; Served: 03/21/20174:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 2029 MCCRAY STREET, #2 BAKERSFIELD, CA 93308 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.