This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/06/2023 at 08:18:35 (UTC).

PAHL VS COUNTY OF KERN

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 PAHL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF KERN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Barmann, Bernard C., Jr., Bradshaw, J. Eric, Smith, T. Mark and Hopper, Tina. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1701

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

Bradshaw, J. Eric

Smith, T. Mark

Hopper, Tina

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAHL, NEVA

PAHL, CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

COUNTY OF KERN

BOWMAN ASPHALT, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLASS, JONATHAN W

Defendant Attorneys

FONTES, MARSHALL S

CHAN, BENSON YU

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

02/16/2023: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Demand for Jury

02/16/2023: Demand for Jury

Stipulation and Order

09/30/2022: Stipulation and Order

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

01/07/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Amended Answer

10/19/2021: Amended Answer

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/17/2021: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Answer to Complaint

02/16/2023: Answer to Complaint

Ruling

02/09/2022: Ruling

Ruling

11/18/2021: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference 04/25/2023

04/25/2023: Further Case Management Conference 04/25/2023

Rejection/Correction Notice

03/09/2023: Rejection/Correction Notice

Further Case Management Conference 01/24/2023

01/24/2023: Further Case Management Conference 01/24/2023

Further Case Management Conference/ Order to Show Cause in re Sanctions 11/23/2022

11/23/2022: Further Case Management Conference/ Order to Show Cause in re Sanctions 11/23/2022

Further Case Management Conference 10/21/2022

10/21/2022: Further Case Management Conference 10/21/2022

Ruling 02/09/2022

02/09/2022: Ruling 02/09/2022

Case Management Conference 01/24/2022

01/24/2022: Case Management Conference 01/24/2022

Rejection/Correction Notice

01/10/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Ruling 11/18/2021

11/18/2021: Ruling 11/18/2021

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/10/2024

HearingCase Number: BCV-21-101701; Style/Defendant: PAHL VS COUNTY OF KERN; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Jury Trial; Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division H; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2024
View Court Documents

DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E = 7-14 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2024

HearingCase Number: BCV-21-101701; Style/Defendant: PAHL VS COUNTY OF KERN; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division H; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2024
View Court Documents

DocketFinal Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: jt = 06/10/24 t/e 7-14 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2024

HearingCase Number: BCV-21-101701; Style/Defendant: PAHL VS COUNTY OF KERN; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judge: Smith, T. Mark; Courtroom: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom T-2 located at 3131 Arrow St.; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2024
View Court Documents

DocketMandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Smith, T. Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: FCMC: 06/07/24 1:30pm Div H; JT: 06/10/24 9am Div H; T/E: 7-14 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf; Comment: Time estimate: 7-14 days The above entitled matter is set for Mandatory Settlement Conference on May 10, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. in BAKERSFIELD TRAFFIC COURTROOM 2 (T-2). The above entitled matter is set for Final Case Management Conference on June 07, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. in Division H before the Honorable Bernard C. Barmann, Jr. (see pretrial rules on the next page). The above entitled matter is set for Trial on June 10, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. in Division H before the Honorable Bernard C. Barmann, Jr.. Your attention is directed to the attached special rules relating to settlement conferences and the California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1380. Duty of the attorneys as to settlement conference: Except as otherwise directed by the Court for good cause shown, all parties, their attorneys and, when a party is insured, a representative of the insurance company who has the authority to settle such case, shall attend the settlement conference. Bakersfield Civil Hearing Locations: Departments 1 through 18 are located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93301 Divisions A through L are located at 1215 Truxtun Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93301 Metropolitan Traffic Division is located at 3131 Arrow St, Bakersfield, CA 93308

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

HearingCase Number: BCV-21-101701; Style/Defendant: PAHL VS COUNTY OF KERN; Case Type: 23-CV Other PI/PD/WD - Civil Unlimited; Hearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Courtroom: Bakersfield Division H; Case Category: Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFurther Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: per stipulation and order 9/30/22, 10/21/22 CONT'D FROM 11/23/22,01/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketCase Management Statement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
10/06/2021

DocketAnswer to Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2021

DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Department of Transportation via personal service.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2021

DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to State of California via personal service.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2021

DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to County of Kern via personal service.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRejection/Correction Notice; Comment: re: Summons and Complaint - Documents have been previously filed. It is unclear as to what is being filed and why. Please contact the Attorney of Record.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2021

DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Served: 08/11/202111:46 AM; Served: 08/13/20212:07 PM; Served: 08/13/20212:07 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/09/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2021

DocketSummons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less