This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 08:48:30 (UTC).

PAHL VS COUNTY OF KERN

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 PAHL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF KERN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1701

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAHL, NEVA

PAHL, CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

COUNTY OF KERN

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLASS, JONATHAN W

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/09/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: re: Summons and Complaint - Documents have been previously filed. It is unclear as to what is being filed and why. Please contact the Attorney of Record.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Department of Transportation via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to State of California via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to County of Kern via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: re: Summons and Complaint - Documents have been previously filed. It is unclear as to what is being filed and why. Please contact the Attorney of Record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/11/202111:46 AM; Served: 08/13/20212:07 PM; Served: 08/13/20212:07 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/09/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUGLASS JONATHAN WARREN