This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:18:20 (UTC).

PADRON VS SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 PADRON filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Gill, Susan M. and Cervantes, Gina. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1031

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Gill, Susan M.

Cervantes, Gina

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PADRON, SANDY MARIE

Respondent

SANCHEZ, ROSALINA MAE

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: Arrangement TOTAL FEES DUE: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Document-Agreement to Satisfy Court - Comment: Ordered Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Cervantes, Gina; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: HRG 1/17/20 DIV A @ 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Domestic Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.