This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 13:23:03 (UTC).

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 12/07/2015 PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Brumfield, Lorna H., Clark, Thomas S., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1623

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BOYLES, DENNY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ALEXANDER, JEFF

JEFF ALEXANDER FARMING

BIG N DEEP AGRICULTURAL DEVELOPMENT

JEFF ALEXANDER, AN INDIVIDUAL DOING BUSINESS AS BIG N DEEP AGRICULTURAL DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BEGAKIS, NICHOLAS J.

ELLIS, DENNIS S

ARNOLD, BARBA

DE THOMAS, COURTNEY T.

BARBA, ARNOLDO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PERLMAN, SCOTT D

DOMINGUEZ, CHRISTOPHER E

WEGIS, RALPH B

HOPPE, THEODORE W

GOLDNER, BARRY L

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: AMENDMENT TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; MISSING A DESIGNATED AREA FOR THE JUDICIAL OFFICERS SIGNATURE.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE; STIPULATION RETURNED VIA; FIRST LEGAL

Further Case Management Conference

MO: Further Case Management Conference 09/29/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: ARNOLD, BARBA; Cross Defendant; Attorney: ARNOLD, BARBA

Case Management Conference

**MO - Public cmc: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Motion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16

**MO - Public motion anti slapp: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/15/16 Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant, PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. 425.16 ResID: 15493; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: ELLIS, DENNIS S; Cross Defendant; Attorney: ELLIS, DENNIS S

Preliminary Injunction

**MO - Public preliminary injunction: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

ruling MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

ex parte MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: filing date: 12-16-15 moving party: Plaintiff Application for order to show cause re civil contempt and modification of temporary restraining order; Parties Present Defendant: ALEXANDER, JEFF

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

ex parte MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filing date; 12-7-15 Moving Party; Plaintiff Pacific Gas & Electric Company. Application for TRO and OSC re; preliminary injunction; Parties Present Defendant: ALEXANDER, JEFF

Trial Setting Conference

Motion to Quash / Trial Setting Conference 09/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: HOPPE, THEODORE W; Attorney: WEGIS, RALPH B; Defendant; Attorney: HOPPE, THEODORE W; Attorney: WEGIS, RALPH B; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HOPPE, THEODORE W; Attorney: WEGIS, RALPH B; Cross Complainant; Attorney: HOPPE, THEODORE W; Attorney: WEGIS, RALPH B

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re-Notice of Motion to Quash - filing code is incorrect, missing $20 filing fee

Ruling

Ruling 08/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) 07/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 06/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 6/14/2018 Filed by Ralph Wegis attorney for Defendant Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Trial Date and All Other Existing Dates, or, in the Alternative, Shortening Time to File and Hear Motion to Continue Trial Date and All Other Existing Dates

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion for Summary Judgment -- Motion is filed but not calendared, reservation expired.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Motion to Compel - no fees

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: SUBSITUTION OF ATTORNEYS; PLEASE BE SPECIFIC AS TO DEFENDANT'S / CROSS COMPLAINANT'S NAME; THE COURT CANNOT ASSUME. MAY CONSIDER USING AN ATTACHMENT TO PROVIDE DEFENDANTS NAME JEFF ALEXANDER FARMING; JEFF ALEXANDER DBA BIG N DEEP AGRICULTURAL DEVELOPMENT; AND ALSO CROSS COMPLAINANTS NAME JEFF ALEXANDER FARMING; AND JEFF ALEXANDER AND INDIVIDUAL DOING BUSINESS AS BIG N DEEP AGRICULTURAL DEVELOPMENT.

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing ruling: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Case Status Conference 12/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: CASE REMAINS STAYED EFFECTIVE 02/05/2019***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Case Status Conference 12/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed 2/5/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketStatement - Comment: Status Conference Statement Regarding Status of Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: & Final Case Management Conference Jury requested by all parties Time Estimate: 12 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 12/14/2018, Plaintiff: Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Motion to Compel Further Responses RE: Damages and Safety Records, ResID: 33721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 11/30/18 Plaintiff, PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY Motion for Summary Judgment, or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Disassociation of Counsel Dennis Ellis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order 02/06/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceeding - Comment: as to Pacific Gas and Electric Company

    Read MoreRead Less
201 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition - ex parte MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filing date; 12-7-15 Moving Party; Plaintiff Pacific Gas & Electric Company. Application for TRO and OSC re; preliminary injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: (supplemental) declaration of Nicholas J Begakis in support of Pacific Gas and Electric Company's ex parte application for temporary restraining order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Elizaveta Malashenko in support of Pacific Gas and Electric Company's ex parte application for temporary restraining order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Nicholas J. Begakis in support of pacific gas and electric company's ex parte application for temporary restraining order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: for TRO and OSC re; preliminary injunction; memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: re; ex parte returned via; ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED AT WINDOW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/21/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

———— s —————— e ———

Upon filing the Cross-Complaint herein, Defendant and Cross-Complamant JEFF ALEXANDER, being ignorant ot the true name of a cross-defendant. and having designated saig cross-defendant in the Cross-Complaint by the fictitious name “ROE 1, and having discovered the true name ot said cross-defendant to be “DENNY BOYLES, an individual.” amends the Cross-Complaint by inserting such true name in the place and stead of such fictitious name whete it appears in said Cross-Complaint.

Dated: Scptember 5. 2017 NATALL, GOLDNER

SIANLIFB & KIMBALL, LLLP

BIG N DELEP AGRICULTURAL

DEVELOPMENT and

JEFF ALEXANDLER FARMING

3ME3492 DOCX Amendment to First Amended Cross-Complaint