This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:49:03 (UTC).

PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION VS BRANDON

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRANDON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1834

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION

Defendant

BRANDON, CAMERON M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUNDO, FRANK G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied Pursuant to CCP 263.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF ORANGE/VIJ RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION; Awarded Against: BRANDON, CAMERON M.; Amount; Damages: $5,526.32; Pre-Judgment Interest: $338.24; Attorney Fees: $610.00; Costs: $270.00; Total: $6744.56; Party: Names: PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION; BRANDON, CAMERON M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO CAMERON M BRANDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketOriginal Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Legal Assignment of Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to CAMERON M BRANDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O Prejudice as to DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO CAMERON M BRANDON, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 05/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/24/17 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less