This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 09:55:46 (UTC).

PACHECO VS MEDRANO

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 PACHECO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MEDRANO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Camacho, Marcos R., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0158

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Camacho, Marcos R.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PACHECO, ARELETTE

Respondent

MEDRANO, MIGUEL ANGEL

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 08/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS, STAY AWAY ORDERS, CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, BATTERER INTERVENTION PROGRAM, OTHER ORDERS

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 07/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS, STAY AWAY ORDERS, CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, BATTERER INTERVENTION PROGRAM, OTHER ORDERS

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 06/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS, STAY AWAY ORDERS, CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, BATTERER INTERVENTION PROGRAM, OTHER ORDERS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 08/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS, STAY AWAY ORDERS, CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, BATTERER INTERVENTION PROGRAM, OTHER ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketRequest to Continue Hearing (Temporary Restraining Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 07/05/2019: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS, STAY AWAY ORDERS, CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, BATTERER INTERVENTION PROGRAM, OTHER ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: OF ONSUCCESSFUL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketRequest to Continue Hearing (Temporary Restraining Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 06/07/2019: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: PERSONAL CONDUCT ORDERS, STAY AWAY ORDERS, CHILD CUSTODY AND VISITATION, CHILD SUPPORT, BATTERER INTERVENTION PROGRAM, OTHER ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Comment: DISSOLUTION DATE 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: PACHECO, ARELETTE; Served: 08/25/20174:21 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less