This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:18:45 (UTC).

PACE ET AL VS GARCIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 PACE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PACE, ALEXA

PACE, STEVEN

Defendants

SHERWIN WILLIAMS CO.

OLIVAREZ, JUAN M.

HERRERA, SYLVIA

RAMOS, RAMIRO

GARCIA, MOISES

OLIVAREZ, SYLVIA

THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLARK, MATTHEW C

FITZ-SIMMONS, DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorneys

PENNINGTON, AMY K

O'DRISCOLL, BRIAN H

LOVE, AVRIL D G

DAVIDSON, JANE H.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Notice of Posting Jury Fees: Missing the $150 - Fees are due at the time of filing

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/17/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Personal service- as to Sherwin Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Personal service- to Ramiro Ramos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Personal service as to Juan M. Olivarez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Personal service as to Sylvia Herrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Moises Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Notice of Posting Jury Fees: Missing the $150 - Fees are due at the time of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Sylvia Olivarez & Juan M. Olivarez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to The Sherwin-Williams Company

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Moises Garcia via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Sherwin Williams Co. via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Ramiro Ramos via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Sylvia Herrera via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Juan M. Olivarez via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/30/20206:50 PM; Served: 01/28/20205:24 PM; Served: 01/29/20205:19 PM; Served: 01/30/20205:24 PM; Served: 01/30/20205:24 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/17/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.