This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 09:42:39 (UTC).

OWENS VS OWENS

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 OWENS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against OWENS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0237

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OWENS, RONALD

Respondent

OWENS, CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 08/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: OWENS, RONALD

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 08/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: OWENS, RONALD

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: OWENS, RONALD; OWENS, CHRISTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Comment: STATUS DATE 1/28/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 08/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 08/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketNotice on Hearing About Court Fees - Granted - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketRequest For Hearing About Court Fees (FW-006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less