This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/28/2018 at 14:17:02 (UTC).

OVERALL VS TARGET CORPORATION DBA TARGET NATIONAL BANK

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 OVERALL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION DBA TARGET NATIONAL BANK. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6671

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OVERALL, LISA

Defendants

TARGET CORPORATION

TARGET NATIONAL BANK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • NP1500 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF ADAM GRAM APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR TARGET CORPORATION DBA TARGET. *************************************************************************************** THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANT: ADAM GRAM EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENSE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT AGAINST PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • 4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Parties Present Plaintiff: OVERALL, LISA; Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Certified Mail Claimed - Comment: AS TO CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • 855A Pmt: Service by Certified Mail (Per Party) CCP 116.232 - Comment: Amount of $10.00 for OVERALL, LISA (PL-1). Received from OVERALL, LISA, check no(s) 1060. Receipt #711294 for amount of $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • 853D Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee ($1,500 or Less) - Comment: Amount of $30.00 for OVERALL, LISA (PL-1). Received from OVERALL, LISA, check no(s) 1060. Receipt #711294 for amount of $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: SENT ON 4/9/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPIES RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "O"

    Read MoreRead Less