This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:15:09 (UTC).

OVERALL VS LANE BRYANT, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 OVERALL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LANE BRYANT, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6670

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OVERALL, LISA

Defendants

LANE BRYANT, INC

LANE BRYANT, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL. ~ calid=2213636 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:06/04/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:LSE, Deputy:ARACELIW, SystemDate:4/9/2013 11:27:12 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Notice - Comment: OF FILING REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Certified Mail Claimed - Comment: AS TO CSC LAWYERS INCORPORATING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • 855A Pmt: Service by Certified Mail (Per Party) CCP 116.232 - Comment: Amount of $10.00 for OVERALL, LISA (PL-1). Received from OVERALL, LISA, check no(s) 1060. Receipt #711293 for amount of $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • 853D Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee ($1,500 or Less) - Comment: Amount of $30.00 for OVERALL, LISA (PL-1). Received from OVERALL, LISA, check no(s) 1060. Receipt #711293 for amount of $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: SENT ON 4/9/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPIES RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "O"

    Read MoreRead Less