This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 20:25:49 (UTC).

ORTIZ VS NAVA

Case Summary

On 03/24/2016 ORTIZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NAVA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0087

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ORTIZ, MARIA

Respondent

NAVA, PAULINO

 

Court Documents

Default

08/05/16 MO: Default: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: ORTIZ, MARIA

Ruling

07/14/2016 MO: Ruling on Default Judgment for Dissolution: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Party: Names: ORTIZ, MARIA; NAVA, PAULINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - 08/05/16 MO: Default: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - 07/14/2016 MO: Ruling on Default Judgment for Dissolution: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: ORTIZ, MARIA; Served: 04/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: VICTOR CRUZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.