This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 06:27:09 (UTC).

ORTIZ VS. GEERS

Case Summary

On 06/15/2012 ORTIZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GEERS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6888

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTIZ, JAIME

Defendants

GEERS, JUDY

MAYS, SABRINA

SIERRA, ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2012
  • DocketExhibit(s) Released to Plaintiff - Comment: RELEASED TO JAIME ORTIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • Docket134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $0.50 for ORTIZ, JAIME (PL-1). Received from JAIME ORTIZ. Receipt #683199 for amount of $1.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • Docket134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $0.50 for ORTIZ, JAIME (PL-1). Received from JAIME ORTIZ. Receipt #683199 for amount of $1.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JAIME ORTIZ (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. JUDY GEERS (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. SABRINA MAYS (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ANTHONY SIERRA (DE-3) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. ROBERTO LUCERO PRESENT AND DULY SWORN AS SPANISH INTERPRETER FOR PLAINTIFF, JAIME ORTIZ. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. JAIME ORTIZ (PL-1) EXHIBIT NUMBER 1 MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION. JAIME ORTIZ (PL-1) EXHIBIT NUMBER 2 MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION. JAIME ORTIZ (PL-1) EXHIBIT NUMBER 3 MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. JAIME ORTIZ (PL-1) EXHIBIT NUMBER 1, 2 AND 3 HERETOFORE MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION IS ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. JUDY GEERS (DE-1) EXHIBIT NUMBER A MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENSE. JUDY GEERS (DE-1) EXHIBIT NUMBER A HERETOFORE MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION IS ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. EXHIBIT LIST ATTACHED AND MADE A PART HEREOF. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR POSSESSION OF PROPERTY. WRIT OF POSSESSION TO ISSUE IF NOT VACATED BY 12:00 NOON, OCTOBER 26, 2012 PLUS COST OF SUIT IS ORDERED.. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):3:19. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • Docket4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court); Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: NOTICE OF TRIAL CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON Oct 18, 2012 AT 1:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT AL, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. THE CASE WILL BE CALLED PROMPTLY AT THE SCHEDULED TIME. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF TRIAL CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL ON Oct 18, 2012 AT 1:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT AL, OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF KERN. THE CASE WILL BE CALLED PROMPTLY AT THE SCHEDULED TIME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • DocketRequest/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD) - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • DocketNP1511 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JAIME ORTIZ (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. MARIA SKAGGS PRESENT AND DULY SWORN AS SPANISH INTERPRETER FOR PLAINTIFF, JAIME ORTIZ. JUDY GEERS (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: PLAINTIFF MUST FILE REQUEST FOR TRIAL DATE. IF NOT FILED BY NEXT COURT DATE, CAUSE WILL BE DISMISSED. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CONTINUED TO OCTOBER 11, 2012 AT 1:30 PM ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):134.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Docket4191 Order to Show Cause (Local Rule 3.15.1(c)) - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL Answer filed 06/29/12 Prejudgement claim filed 06/25/12

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2012
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: FILED BY: JUDGY GEERS DATE: 06/22/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • DocketAnswer - Comment: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY: JUDY GEERS DATE: 06/22/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER WHO SERVED: JAIME ORTIZ HOW SERVED: PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED: 06/21/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • Docket134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $4.00 for GEERS, JUDY (DE-1). Received from JUDY GEERS. Receipt #660949 for amount of $4.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. ______________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 629 MAIN STREET, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Sep 20, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.17.1(C) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Sep 20, 2012 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ GARY R WITT Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for ORTIZ, JAIME (PL-1). Received from JAIME ORTIZ, check no(s) 1506. Receipt #660801 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 687

    Read MoreRead Less