This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/03/2020 at 08:59:19 (UTC).

ORTEGA VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 ORTEGA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0013

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTEGA, ALFREDO

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOLONZ, ADAM M.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/17/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to General Motors LLC via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/07/20203:27 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/17/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.