This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/04/2018 at 13:03:26 (UTC).

ORDAZ VS TATE ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 ORDAZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against TATE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1529

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORDAZ, RAFAEL

Defendants

TATE, HAROLD

S.SHEISHA

L.NGUYEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

AGESON, MARTIN

MCMAHON, THOMAS M

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 11/02/17. Jury Fees paid by Defendants; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss 03/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/5/2018 DEFENDANTS HAROLD TATE, M.D.; L. NGUYEN; SAM SHIESHA, M.D. MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO AMEND COMPLAINT; Parties Present Plaintiff: ORDAZ, RAFAEL; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M

Ruling

Ruling 09/18/2017: Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: proposed order on motion to dismiss

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Jury fees paid by defendants. Continued from 11/02/2017 and 01/31/2018.; Parties Present Plaintiff: ORDAZ, RAFAEL; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: ORDAZ, RAFAEL

Demurrer

Demurrer/Motion to Strike 08/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/2/17 Defendants, L. Nguyen, S. Shiesha, Harold Tate Notice of Hearing; Demurrers to Complaint by Defendants; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Parties Present Plaintiff: ORDAZ, RAFAEL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Cont'd from 11/02/17, 01/31/18, and 03/14/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: proposed order on motion to dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss - Motion to Dismiss 03/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/5/2018 DEFENDANTS HAROLD TATE, M.D.; L. NGUYEN; SAM SHIESHA, M.D. MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO AMEND COMPLAINT; Parties Present Plaintiff: ORDAZ, RAFAEL; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Conference 03/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Jury fees paid by defendants. Continued from 11/02/2017 and 01/31/2018.; Parties Present Plaintiff: ORDAZ, RAFAEL; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Facsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: DIRECTED TO CURRENT LITIGATION COORDINATOR RE ORDER FOR COURT CALL APPEARANCE RAFAEL ORDAZ ON 3/28/2018 AT 830AM IN DEPARTMENT 12. [COPY OF COURT CALL CONFIRMATION MAILED TO PLAINTIFF BY U.S. MAIL]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Notice of Motion - Comment: RE: Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Amend Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Thomas M. McMahon in Support Thereof HEARING:3/28/2018 TIME: 8:30 AM DEPARTMENT: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE ON ORDER ON DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Facsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: DIRECTED TO CURRENT LITIGATION COORDINATOR RE ORDER FOR COURT CALL APPEARANCE RAFAEL ORDAZ ON 3/14/2018 AT 830AM IN DEPARTMENT 12. [COPY OF COURT CALL CONFIRMATION MAILED TO PLAINTIFF BY U.S. MAIL]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Conference 01/31/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 11/02/17. Jury Fees paid by Defendants; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M; Defendant; Attorney: MCMAHON, THOMAS M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Facsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: DIRECTED TO CURRENT LITIGATION COORDINATOR RE ORDER FOR COURT CALL APPEARANCE RAFAEL ORDAZ ON 1/31/2018 AT 830AM IN DEPARTMENT 12. [COPY OF COURT CALL CONFIRMATION MAILED TO PLAINTIFF BY U.S. MAIL]

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO HAROLD TATE, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: ORDAZ, RAFAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Facsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: DIRECTED TO CURRENT LITIGATION COORDINATOR RE ORDER FOR COURT CALL APPEARANCE RAFAEL ORDAZ ON 7/6/17 AND 9/19/17 AT 830AM IN DEPARTMENT 12. [COPY OF COURT CALL CONFIRMATION MAILED TO PLAINTIFF BY U.S. MAIL]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA USPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/06/17 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO RAFAEL ORDAZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO RAFAEL ORDAZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.