This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:57:31 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC VS MEDRANO

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MEDRANO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0030

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP

PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

MEDRANO, ANDREW ANTHONIC

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

MO - Trial (Small Claims): Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Req for Dism After Hearing/Trial (CS/FAM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: ANDREW ANTHONIC MEDRANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - MO - Trial (Small Claims): Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Fictitious Business Name Declaration (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less