Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:16:08 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC VS DOMINGUEZ

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DOMINGUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0029

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

OPORTUN INC

Defendant

DOMINGUEZ, HORACIO RAMOS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: OPORTUN INC; Awarded Against: DOMINGUEZ, HORACIO RAMOS; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $110.00; Total: $2610.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: OPORTUN INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Fictitious Business Name Declaration (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less