This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:58:01 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP. VS GALVAN

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GALVAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1342

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant

GALVAN, OMEGA

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Minute Order-Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.; Judgment Amount: $2,166.00; Awarded Against: GALVAN, OMEGA; Comment: Plus court costs to be determined by the clerk and cancellation of the original contract.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Original Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Authorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Sherly Recinos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - Minute Order-Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Omega Galvan/Sub service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINANCIAL CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA RZ

    Read MoreRead Less