This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:10:25 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP. VS LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOPEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0348

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.

Defendant

LOPEZ, REGINA R

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 12/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.; Awarded Against: LOPEZ, REGINA R; Amount; Damages: $749.22; Costs: $95.00; Total: $844.22; Party: Names: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.; LOPEZ, REGINA R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 12/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.; Served: 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketFictitious Business Name Declaration (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.