This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:10:35 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP. VS HINOJOZA

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HINOJOZA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0350

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.

Defendant

HINOJOZA, DIANA JAZMIN MARTINEZ

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 12/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed; Parties Present Plaintiff: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed to Diana Jazmin Martinez Hinojoza (DE-1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Req for Dism After Hearing/Trial (CS/FAM); Party: Names: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.; HINOJOZA, DIANA JAZMIN MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 12/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.; Served: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketFictitious Business Name Declaration (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.