This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:10:11 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP. VS ESTRADA

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ESTRADA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0346

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.

Defendant

ESTRADA, ESPERANZA ZAVALA

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 12/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed to Esperanza Zavala Estrada (DE-1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.; Awarded Against: ESTRADA, ESPERANZA ZAVALA; Amount; Damages: $2,404.82; Costs: $115.00; Total: $2519.82; Party: Names: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.; ESTRADA, ESPERANZA ZAVALA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 12/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.; Served: 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketFictitious Business Name Declaration (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.