This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:10:42 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP. VS CAMPOS

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 OPORTUN INC FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CAMPOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0351

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.

Defendant

CAMPOS, EDDIE O

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: No Proof Of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Lack of Prosecution Before Trial; Party: Names: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.; CAMPOS, EDDIE O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketDismissed Without Prejudice - Comment: No Proof of service on Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: OPORTUN INC. FKA PROGRESS FINACIAL CORP.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketFictitious Business Name Declaration (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.