This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/16/2020 at 09:33:34 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC VS RUELAS

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RUELAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0114

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OneMain Financial Group, LLC

Defendant

Ruelas, Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS, VANESSA A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: THOMAS, VANESSA A., ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less