This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/01/2020 at 09:17:30 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC VS BROCAILLE

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BROCAILLE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0025

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC

Defendant

BROCAILLE, SCOTT W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERK, CAMRYN P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Scott W. Brocaille, 1 attempt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to defendant Scott W Brocaille, 1 attempt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Scott W. Brocaille, 1 attempt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.