This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:15:40 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR (ASF) WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2015-1 VS CLEVELAND

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ASF WELLS FARGO BANK, N A , AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2015-1 filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLEVELAND. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0047

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR (ASF) WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2015-1

Defendant

CLEVELAND, MARY L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERK, CAMRYN P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Mary L. Cleveland, 1 attempt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Mary L. Cleveland, 3 attempts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.