This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:43:27 (UTC).

O'NEILL VS BELHOVSKYI

Case Summary

On 01/20/2016 O'NEILL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BELHOVSKYI. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0029

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

O'NEILL, ASHLEY MARIE

Respondent

BELHOVSKYI, DENYS DMYTROVYCH

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: O'NEILL, ASHLEY MARIE; BELHOVSKYI, DENYS DMYTROVYCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: STATUS DATE 8/16/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.