This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:55:09 (UTC).

O'NEILL ET AL VS BURRIS ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 O'NEILL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BURRIS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brehmer, Charles R., Brumfield, Lorna H., Etienne, Linda S. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0458

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brehmer, Charles R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Etienne, Linda S.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

O'NEILL, COLLEEN M.

O'NEILL, RAYMOND D.

Defendants

JORDAN, CHERYL

GASKILL, QUINT MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BISH, MINDY S

BROWN, DANIEL A

Defendant Attorney

DE SPELDER, ROBERT B

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing cmc: Judicial Officer: Brehmer, Charles R.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Motion to Compel

**MO - Public motion to compel: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3/11/16 Defendants, QUINT GASKILL & CHERYL JORDAN Motion to Compel Discovery Resonses ResID: 15484; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: DE SPELDER, ROBERT B; Defendant; Attorney: DE SPELDER, ROBERT B

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

**MO - Public osc: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AT HEARING ON 01/12/2016

Ruling

Ruling 11/02/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

osc MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DECLARATION OF MINDY RE OSC 03/08/17. MISSING EXHIBIT "A"

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FTA ON 02/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FOR FAILING TO APPEAR ON 02/06/2017 AND FAILING TO FILE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: COMPLAINT, WITHOUT PREJUDCIE AS TO RAYMOND O'NEIL ONLY NOTIFIED COUNSEL MINDY S. BISH'S OFFICE, SPOKE TO ERIKA, CASE IS DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Mindy Re: OSC 03/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DECLARATION OF MINDY RE OSC 03/08/17. MISSING EXHIBIT "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With prejudice as to Colleen O'Neil only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: ***AS TO THOMAS S CLARK***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 02/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: SUBSTITUTED, AS TO, QUINT MATTHEW GASKILL. 9/29/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: of non service as to Cheryl Jordan Burris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: of non service as to Quint Matthew Gaskill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Association of Attorney - Comment: Associating attorney; Mindy Bish Original Attorney; Robert M. Zavidow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Application / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/29/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less