Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 19:16:32 (UTC).

ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. VS A S T TRANSPORT INC.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 ON DECK CAPITAL, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against A S T TRANSPORT INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Palmer - Retired, William D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2414

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Palmer - Retired, William D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ON DECK CAPITAL, INC.

Defendant

A S T TRANSPORT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, JANET L

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/29/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Palmer - Retired, William D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/29/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ON DECK CAPITAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, JANET L