This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 20:21:57 (UTC).

OLMOS VS OLMOS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2015 OLMOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against OLMOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr., Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Zulfa, David and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5744

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Zulfa, David

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OLMOS, DANIEL

Respondent

OLMOS, BETHANIEE A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FU, JOHN K

Attorney at LAW OFC JOHNFU

1505 N San Fernando Blvd #A

Burbank, CA 91504

Respondent Attorney

WEAVER, CLAUDIA A

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/09/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DECLARATION & FL-150

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 01/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 09/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: WEAVER, CLAUDIA A

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 09/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: IWO

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 06/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 5/8/17 PER STIP & ORDER FILED ON 5/8/17; Parties Present Petitioner: OLMOS, DANIEL; Attorney: FU, JOHN K; Respondent: OLMOS, BETHANIEE A; Attorney: WEAVER, CLAUDIA A

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 03/20/2017: Judicial Officer(s): Bittleston, Dawn, Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Request for Order - Respondent

01/09/17 MO: Request for Order-Respondent: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: OLMOS, DANIEL; Attorney: FU, JOHN K; Respondent: OLMOS, BETHANIEE A; Attorney: WEAVER, CLAUDIA A

Request for Order - Respondent

01/09/17 MO: Request for Order - Respondent (B): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Department Transfer; Parties Present Petitioner: OLMOS, DANIEL; Attorney: FU, JOHN K; Respondent: OLMOS, BETHANIEE A; Attorney: WEAVER, CLAUDIA A

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketConfirmation of Special Setting - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/09/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration - Comment: Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement - Comment: Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DECLARATION & FL-150

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketAt Issue Court Trial < 1 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for OLMOS, DANIEL (PE-1). Received from DANIEL OLMOS, check no(s) 402071. Receipt #826508 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.