This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:43:51 (UTC).

OLIVAREZ VS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 OLIVAREZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0036

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OLIVAREZ, YESENIA

Respondent

MARTINEZ, JUAN F

 

Court Documents

Default

**MO - Default Hearing: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: OLIVAREZ, YESENIA

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketOrder to Pay Waived Court Fees and Costs - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS: 03/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Party: Names: OLIVAREZ, YESENIA; MARTINEZ, JUAN F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - **MO - Default Hearing: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketDefault Setting Card - Comment: Hearing Date:02/19/2016 Hearing Time: 9:00 AM Hearing Department/Division:A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketDefault - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Default Hearing Court Date: 10/30/2015 Time: 9:00 am Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: OLIVAREZ, YESENIA; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less