This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:45:01 (UTC).

OLEA VS ROMERO (E)

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 OLEA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROMERO E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Loo, Cynthia L. and Foley, Therese M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1923

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Loo, Cynthia L.

Foley, Therese M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OLEA, MARIA GLORIA

Respondent

ROMERO, RONNY DORWIN

 

Court Documents

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 02/21/2020: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG CONTD FROM 6/19/19 8/14/19 10/22/19 1/02/20

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 10/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG CONTD FROM 6/19/19 8/14/19

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 06/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 09/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 4/24/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 6/07/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 06/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 4/24/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 02/21/2020: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG CONTD FROM 6/19/19 8/14/19 10/22/19 1/02/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG CONTD FROM 6/19/19 8/14/19 10/22/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 10/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG CONTD FROM 6/19/19 8/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG CONTD FROM 6/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 06/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/10/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: FOR FCCR HRG 6/19/19 DIV. E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 09/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 4/24/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT'D FROM 6/07/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 06/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 4/24/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 6/7/2018 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less