This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/21/2022 at 08:14:16 (UTC).

OCTAVIO TAMAYO, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF THE ESTATE OF MARGARET TAMAYO VS GUILD MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 OCTAVIO TAMAYO, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF THE ESTATE OF MARGARET TAMAYO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GUILD MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1653

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCTAVIO TAMAYO, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF THE ESTATE OF MARGARET TAMAYO

Defendants

GUILD MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANPARYS NICHOLAS H

Defendant Attorney

MIKA BRANDON J

 

Court Documents

Complaint

07/06/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

07/06/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

07/08/2022: Order to Show Cause

Electronic Rejection Notice

07/08/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Summons Issued and Filed

07/12/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Stipulation and Order

08/11/2022: Stipulation and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation and Order; Comment: to Extend National Default Servicing Corporation's Responsive Pleading Deadline, GRANTED; Filed By: DEFENDANT - NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION|PLAINTIFF - OCTAVIO TAMAYO, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF THE ESTATE OF MARGARET TAMAYO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - OCTAVIO TAMAYO, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF THE ESTATE OF MARGARET TAMAYO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Summons: Summons section, 'Notice To The Person Served', must be left blank/un-selected when initially filing. Please correct and re-file into the existing case. Please correct and re-file into the existing case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 10/21/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - OCTAVIO TAMAYO, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF THE ESTATE OF MARGARET TAMAYO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - OCTAVIO TAMAYO, AN INDIVIDUAL, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF THE ESTATE OF MARGARET TAMAYO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases where Guild Mortgage Company, a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKA BRANDON J